Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0585)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0553)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0553 (SB0585) Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 (HB0553) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM