Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 (SB0513)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 /CH0321
Title
Termination of Maryland Health Insurance Plan, Transfer of Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program, and Funding for State Reinsurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0497)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908
Title
Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0595)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0377)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0377 (SB0513) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0489 /CH0321 Termination of Maryland Health Insurance Plan, Transfer of Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program, and Funding for State Reinsurance Program Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 (SB0497) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0908 Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 (HB0595) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 (HB0377) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM