Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189
Title
Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 (SB0379)
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Economic Impact Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 /CH0571 (SB0967/CH0572)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379 (HB0932)
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 (HB0580)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 /CH0572 (HB1329/CH0571)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020
Title
Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0189 Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0932 (SB0379) Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Economic Impact Statements Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1329 /CH0571 (SB0967/CH0572) Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017 Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0379 (HB0932) Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0476 (HB0580) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 /CH0572 (HB1329/CH0571) Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017 Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1020 Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017 Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM