Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Hospitals – Changes in Status – Notification and Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 (SB0784)
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 /CH0019
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 /CH0018
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1323)
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 (HB0849)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018
Title
Health Facilities - Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Hospitals – Changes in Status – Notification and Approval Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0940 Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project – Study Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1323 (SB0784) Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 /CH0019 University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0619 /CH0018 University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0784 (HB1323) Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0803 (HB0849) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 Health Facilities - Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM