Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hearing Aids

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1355
Title
Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1355 Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Revisions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Senator Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM