Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Heating and Cooling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287 (SB0867)
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1568 (SB0954)
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Maintenance Technician - License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1569 (SB0684)
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1611
Title
Income Tax Credit - HVAC Energy Efficiency Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0349
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the Secretary
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB1569)
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 (HB1287)
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1568)
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Maintenance Technician - License Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Delegate Frick 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Economic Matters
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1287 (SB0867) Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1568 (SB0954) State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Maintenance Technician - License Requirements Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1569 (SB0684) Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1611 Income Tax Credit - HVAC Energy Efficiency Technology Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0349 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the Secretary Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 (HB1569) Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0867 (HB1287) Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 (HB1568) State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Maintenance Technician - License Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM