Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Heating and Cooling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0254
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0461)
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0329)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc of Howard County HVAC System Replacement Ho. Co. 3-17
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 (SB0334)
Title
Education - School Emergency Air-Conditioning Fund - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1535
Title
Income Tax Credit - HVAC Air Stratification Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0329 (HB0407)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc of Howard County HVAC System Replacement Ho. Co. 3-17
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 (HB0692)
Title
Education - School Emergency Air-Conditioning Fund - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB0405)
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0246 /CH0254 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0405 (SB0461) Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0407 (SB0329) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc of Howard County HVAC System Replacement Ho. Co. 3-17 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0692 (SB0334) Education - School Emergency Air-Conditioning Fund - Established Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1535 Income Tax Credit - HVAC Air Stratification Technology Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0329 (HB0407) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc of Howard County HVAC System Replacement Ho. Co. 3-17 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0334 (HB0692) Education - School Emergency Air-Conditioning Fund - Established Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0461 (HB0405) Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications Senator Conway 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM