Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Heating and Cooling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 /CH0308 (SB0434)
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218 (SB0785)
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426 (SB0739)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0722/CH0308)
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 (HB1426)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB1218)
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0595
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0722 /CH0308 (SB0434) Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 308
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1218 (SB0785) Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
HB1426 (SB0739) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0434 (HB0722/CH0308) Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0739 (HB1426) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0785 (HB1218) Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0891 Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB1081 /CH0595 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:20 PM