Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Heating and Cooling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040
Title
Maryland Energy Administration Study on Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems and Geothermal Energy Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB0462)
Title
Public Utilities – Low–Income Housing – Energy Performance Targets
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Wastewater Heating or Cooling System
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778
Title
Income Tax – Healthy Indoor Air Quality Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0738)
Title
Income Tax – Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0810)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462 (HB0379)
Title
Public Utilities - Low-Income Housing - Energy Performance Targets
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661
Title
Environment - Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund - Funding, Reallocation, Reimbursements, and Study
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB0982)
Title
Income Tax - Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 (HB1007)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 Maryland Energy Administration Study on Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems and Geothermal Energy Workgroup Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0379 (SB0462) Public Utilities – Low–Income Housing – Energy Performance Targets Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0561 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Wastewater Heating or Cooling System Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/29/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0778 Income Tax – Healthy Indoor Air Quality Tax Credit Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0982 (SB0738) Income Tax – Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1007 (SB0810) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1362 Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0418 Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0462 (HB0379) Public Utilities - Low-Income Housing - Energy Performance Targets Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0661 Environment - Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund - Funding, Reallocation, Reimbursements, and Study Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0738 (HB0982) Income Tax - Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0810 (HB1007) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 11:21 AM
Click to return on the top page