Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Higher Education Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394 (SB0317/CH0149)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 (SB0319/CH0591)
Title
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426 /CH0589 (SB0311/CH0588)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Public Health Advisories - Required Communication
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 /CH0328
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Teacher Preparation Programs - Accreditation and Approval
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 (SB0869)
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and Scholarships
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971 (SB0872/CH0612)
Title
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1595 /CH0847 (SB1127/CH0848)
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0149 (HB0394)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 /CH0591 (HB0413)
Title
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB0868)
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and Scholarships
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 /CH0612 (HB0971)
Title
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 /CH0574 (HB1082/CH0573)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1127 /CH0848 (HB1595/CH0847)
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1173
Title
Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0394 (SB0317/CH0149) More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0413 (SB0319/CH0591) Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0426 /CH0589 (SB0311/CH0588) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0427 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Public Health Advisories - Required Communication Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0715 /CH0328 Institutions of Higher Education - Teacher Preparation Programs - Accreditation and Approval Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 (SB0869) Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and Scholarships Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0931 Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0971 (SB0872/CH0612) James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1142 Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student Organizations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - Notification Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1366 Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - Disclosure Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1595 /CH0847 (SB1127/CH0848) Baltimore City Community College - Realignment Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Appropriations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0317 /CH0149 (HB0394) More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0319 /CH0591 (HB0413) Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0712 Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0869 (HB0868) Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and Scholarships Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0872 /CH0612 (HB0971) James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1060 /CH0574 (HB1082/CH0573) Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act) Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1127 /CH0848 (HB1595/CH0847) Baltimore City Community College - Realignment Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1173 Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2017 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM