Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

High Voltage Lines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 /CH0003 (SB0275)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0501 (SB0563/CH0500)
Title
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Electric Reliability - Priorities and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238 (SB0853)
Title
Utility Companies - Removal of Lines from Utility Poles
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563 /CH0500 (HB0554/CH0501)
Title
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1238)
Title
Utility Companies - Removal of Lines from Utility Poles
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0226 /CH0003 (SB0275) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Economic Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 /CH0501 (SB0563/CH0500) Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications Delegate Schuh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1152 Electric Reliability - Priorities and Funding Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1238 (SB0853) Utility Companies - Removal of Lines from Utility Poles Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0563 /CH0500 (HB0554/CH0501) Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 (HB1238) Utility Companies - Removal of Lines from Utility Poles Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM