Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

High Voltage Lines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0460/CH0174)
Title
Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 /CH0431
Title
Public Service Commission - Attachments to Utility Poles - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0174 (HB0469)
Title
Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0469 (SB0460/CH0174) Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines Delegate Jameson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0541 /CH0431 Public Service Commission - Attachments to Utility Poles - Study Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Economic Matters
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0174 (HB0469) Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM