Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

High Voltage Lines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 (SB0771)
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Rate Regulation - Fixed Charges for Distribution System Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0392 (SB0851)
Title
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0996)
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Rate Regulation - Fixed Charges for Distribution System Costs
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 (HB1350/CH0392)
Title
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 (HB1592)
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0996 (SB0771) Electric Cooperatives - Rate Regulation - Fixed Charges for Distribution System Costs Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1133 Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0392 (SB0851) Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan Delegate Rose 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Economic Matters
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0996) Electric Cooperatives - Rate Regulation - Fixed Charges for Distribution System Costs Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0851 (HB1350/CH0392) Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 (HB1592) Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM