Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

High Voltage Lines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773 (SB0695)
Title
Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 /CH0773
Title
Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 (SB0692)
Title
Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Location
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 (SB0691)
Title
Electric Facilities - Condemnation - Conserved Land
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 /CH0282 (SB0696)
Title
Construction of Transmission Lines – Landowners – Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126 /CH0283
Title
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Criteria to Consider
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Local Government - Overhead Transmission Lines - Property Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1568
Title
Public Service Companies – Facility Equipment – Removal
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0812)
Title
Electric Facilities – Condemnation – Conserved Land
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692 (HB0794)
Title
Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Location
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0773)
Title
Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission Approval
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB0869/CH0282)
Title
Construction of Transmission Lines - Landowners - Notification
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0773 (SB0695) Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission Approval Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 /CH0773 Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice Requirements Delegate Impallaria 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 (SB0692) Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Location Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0812 (SB0691) Electric Facilities - Condemnation - Conserved Land Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 /CH0282 (SB0696) Construction of Transmission Lines – Landowners – Notification Delegate Szeliga 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1126 /CH0283 Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Criteria to Consider Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Economic Matters
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1490 Local Government - Overhead Transmission Lines - Property Maintenance Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1568 Public Service Companies – Facility Equipment – Removal Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0812) Electric Facilities – Condemnation – Conserved Land Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 (HB0794) Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Location Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 (HB0773) Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission Approval Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0696 (HB0869/CH0282) Construction of Transmission Lines - Landowners - Notification Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM