Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Highway Administration, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0083
Title
Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0371/CH0028)
Title
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539
Title
State Highway Administration - Evaluation of Urban Highways - Classifications and Speed Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 (SB0656)
Title
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913 /CH0286
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Local Government Reporting - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920
Title
State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0138 (SB0774)
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public Libraries
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 /CH0303
Title
Procurement - Contracts for Pretreatment and Removal of Snow and Ice
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0028 (HB0450)
Title
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0621)
Title
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682
Title
Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With Virginia
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 (HB0940/CH0138)
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0286 /CH0083 Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0450 (SB0371/CH0028) State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas Delegate Carr 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 State Highway Administration - Evaluation of Urban Highways - Classifications and Speed Limits Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0621 (SB0656) State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0762 State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 /CH0286 Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Local Government Reporting - Revisions Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of Costs Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 /CH0138 (SB0774) Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB1153 State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public Libraries Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1224 /CH0303 Procurement - Contracts for Pretreatment and Removal of Snow and Ice Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0028 (HB0450) State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB0621) State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0682 Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With Virginia Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 (HB0940/CH0138) Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM