Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Historical Matters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011
Title
Public Schools - African American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0151)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092
Title
Procurement - Invasive and Nonnative Plant Species - Prohibition on Use of State Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140
Title
Commission on History, Culture, and Civics in Education
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539 (SB0447)
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Certified Historic Structure and Single-Family, Owner-Occupied Residence - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0659)
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Small Commercial Projects – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937 (SB0660)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099
Title
Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132 (SB0839)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0082)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 (HB0539)
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Certified Historic Structure and Single–Family, Owner–Occupied Residence – Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0659 (HB0865)
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Small Commercial Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660 (HB0937)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662
Title
Education – Commission on Multicultural Education – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB1132)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885
Title
Economic and Community Development - Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903
Title
Labor and Employment – Traditional Trade Apprenticeship Fund
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 Public Schools - African American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0082 (SB0151) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0092 Procurement - Invasive and Nonnative Plant Species - Prohibition on Use of State Funds Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0121 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0140 Commission on History, Culture, and Civics in Education Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0297 Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0322 Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0539 (SB0447) Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Certified Historic Structure and Single-Family, Owner-Occupied Residence - Definitions Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0865 (SB0659) Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Small Commercial Projects – Alterations Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0937 (SB0660) State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1099 Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1132 (SB0839) Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1158 Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0151 (HB0082) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0447 (HB0539) Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Certified Historic Structure and Single–Family, Owner–Occupied Residence – Definitions Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0659 (HB0865) Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Small Commercial Projects - Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0660 (HB0937) State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 Education – Commission on Multicultural Education – Establishment Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB1132) Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0885 Economic and Community Development - Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0903 Labor and Employment – Traditional Trade Apprenticeship Fund Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0946 Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 1:30 PM
Click to return on the top page