Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 /CH0582 (SB0593)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134
Title
State Government - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148
Title
Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0657/CH0324)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 16-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475 (SB0588)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0602
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Juneteenth National Freedom Day
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
State Government - Commemorative Days - Diwali Day
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799 (SB0703)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Children's Dental Health Month
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Registered Sex Offenders - Prohibition - Halloween Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0011
Title
Commemoration of World Autism Awareness Day
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066
Title
State Government - Commemorative Day - Young Heroes Day
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 (HB0475)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB0040/CH0582)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans Day
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 /CH0324 (HB0463)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB0799)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Children's Dental Health Month
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Commemoration of the 60th Anniversary of the Addition of "Under God" to the Pledge of Allegiance
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 /CH0582 (SB0593) State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month Delegate Murphy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0134 State Government - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0148 Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 (SB0657/CH0324) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 16-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0475 (SB0588) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0549 /CH0602 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Juneteenth National Freedom Day Delegate Stukes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0762 State Government - Commemorative Days - Diwali Day Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0799 (SB0703) General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Children's Dental Health Month Delegate Tarrant 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 Registered Sex Offenders - Prohibition - Halloween Activities Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0011 Commemoration of World Autism Awareness Day Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
SB0066 State Government - Commemorative Day - Young Heroes Day Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 (HB0475) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB0040/CH0582) State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0651 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans Day Senator Getty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0657 /CH0324 (HB0463) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0703 (HB0799) General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Children's Dental Health Month Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 Commemoration of the 60th Anniversary of the Addition of "Under God" to the Pledge of Allegiance Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM