Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 /CH0241 (SB0889)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall Day
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 (SB0455)
Title
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Election Law - Primary Elections and Early Voting - Dates
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0400)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746 /CH0170 (SB0422/CH0169)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0486)
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Public School Holidays - References in Official Publications (Public School Holiday Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH0001 (SB0080/CH0002)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0002 (HB1118/CH0001)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans Day
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 (HB0572)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0169 (HB0746/CH0170)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 (HB0389)
Title
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0849)
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Public School Holidays - References in Official Publications (Public School Holiday Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB0340/CH0241)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall Day
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 /CH0241 (SB0889) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall Day Delegate Haynes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0389 (SB0455) Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 Election Law - Primary Elections and Early Voting - Dates Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 (SB0400) State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 /CH0170 (SB0422/CH0169) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0849 (SB0486) Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Public School Holidays - References in Official Publications (Public School Holiday Protection Act) Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HB1118 /CH0001 (SB0080/CH0002) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0080 /CH0002 (HB1118/CH0001) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0180 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans Day Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 (HB0572) State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 /CH0169 (HB0746/CH0170) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0455 (HB0389) Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0849) Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Public School Holidays - References in Official Publications (Public School Holiday Protection Act) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0889 (HB0340/CH0241) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall Day Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM