Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091 /CH0389 (SB0442/CH0388)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 (SB0594)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Watermen's Day
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620
Title
Elementary and Secondary Education - Required Number of School Days - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626
Title
Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Farmers' Day
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0837)
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996
Title
Education - Public School Holidays - Easter Monday
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174 (SB0353)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Fred Korematsu Day
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans Day
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319 (SB0620/CH0415)
Title
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 (SB0767)
Title
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1595
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Public Schools - Post-Labor Day Start Date
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269
Title
Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353 (HB1174)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Fred Korematsu Day
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 /CH0388 (HB0091/CH0389)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594 (HB0270)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 /CH0415 (HB1319)
Title
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 (HB1349)
Title
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0091 /CH0389 (SB0442/CH0388) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2016 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0270 (SB0594) General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0614 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Watermen's Day Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 Elementary and Secondary Education - Required Number of School Days - Repeal Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0626 Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Farmers' Day Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 (SB0837) Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0996 Education - Public School Holidays - Easter Monday Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 (SB0353) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Fred Korematsu Day Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1216 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans Day Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 (SB0620/CH0415) Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week Delegate Frush 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1349 (SB0767) Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1595 Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0005 Public Schools - Post-Labor Day Start Date Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0269 Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0353 (HB1174) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Fred Korematsu Day Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 /CH0388 (HB0091/CH0389) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0594 (HB0270) General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0620 /CH0415 (HB1319) Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 (HB1349) Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM