Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Farmers' Day
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Watermen's Day
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0580/CH0680)
Title
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
Education - Public School Holidays - Presidents' Day and Easter Monday
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0130
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale MC 8-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 (SB0603)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - International Gang Awareness Day
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 /CH0400
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412
Title
Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day and Easter Monday
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1462
Title
State Designations - Henrietta Lacks Day
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1657 (SB1166)
Title
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001 (SJ0001)
Title
National Day of the Cowboy
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Brain Cancer Awareness Day
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 /CH0680 (HB0324)
Title
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 (HB0576)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 /CH0478
Title
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1166 (HB1657)
Title
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1193
Title
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 (HJ0001)
Title
National Day of the Cowboy
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0020 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Farmers' Day Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0029 Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0057 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Watermen's Day Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0324 (SB0580/CH0680) State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave Delegate Korman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 Education - Public School Holidays - Presidents' Day and Easter Monday Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 /CH0130 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale MC 8-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 (SB0603) General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0841 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - International Gang Awareness Day Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1314 /CH0400 Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1412 Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day and Easter Monday Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1462 State Designations - Henrietta Lacks Day Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1657 (SB1166) State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0001 (SJ0001) National Day of the Cowboy Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Brain Cancer Awareness Day Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 /CH0680 (HB0324) State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0603 (HB0576) General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 /CH0478 Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1166 (HB1657) State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event Senator Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1193 Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0001 (HJ0001) National Day of the Cowboy Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM