Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Foster Care Month
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Foster Youth Legislative Shadow Days
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299 (SB0141)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313
Title
Education - Commemoration - Terrorist Attacks of September 11, 2001
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539 (SB0791)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668
Title
Pediatric Stroke - Awareness, Training, and Resource Materials
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Spotted Turtle Awareness Day
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB1178)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1762 (SB1199)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Pongal Day
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0299)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0539)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1171
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmen and Sportswomen Month
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1178 (HB1298)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1199 (HB1762)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1240
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days and Months - Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Foster Care Month Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0052 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Foster Youth Legislative Shadow Days Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0121 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0299 (SB0141) Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0313 Education - Commemoration - Terrorist Attacks of September 11, 2001 Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 (SB0791) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0668 Pediatric Stroke - Awareness, Training, and Resource Materials Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Spotted Turtle Awareness Day Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 (SB1178) General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1762 (SB1199) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Pongal Day Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0141 (HB0299) Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0539) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1171 General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmen and Sportswomen Month Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1178 (HB1298) General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1199 (HB1762) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1240 General Provisions - Commemorative Days and Months - Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM