Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Hangul Day
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 (SB0020)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743 (SB0558)
Title
Universal School Start Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868
Title
State and Public School Holidays - Designation and Observance
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906 (SB0620)
Title
Pongal Day
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0950 (SB0464)
Title
Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0009
Title
Democracy Day
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 (HB0716)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076
Title
Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 (HB0950)
Title
Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0743)
Title
Universal School Start Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0906)
Title
Pongal Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0122 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Hangul Day Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0716 (SB0020) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0743 (SB0558) Universal School Start Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 State and Public School Holidays - Designation and Observance Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Health and Government Operations
Ways and Means
HB0895 Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 (SB0620) Pongal Day Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0950 (SB0464) Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HJ0009 Democracy Day Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0020 (HB0716) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0076 Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0464 (HB0950) Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0743) Universal School Start Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0620 (HB0906) Pongal Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/12/2020 6:26 PM