Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057 /CH0606 (SB0355/CH0239)
Title
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0084
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regulatory Authority - Permit and Licensing Renewals and Building Plan Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0239 (HB0057/CH0606)
Title
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 /CH0606 (SB0355/CH0239) Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry Workgroup Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0164 /CH0084 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regulatory Authority - Permit and Licensing Renewals and Building Plan Reviews Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 /CH0239 (HB0057/CH0606) Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry Workgroup Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM