Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0432)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Database of Direct Access Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590 /CH0413
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0505)
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996
Title
Admissibility of Writings or Records of Health Care Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0532)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Plan for Creation and Implementation of a Database of Direct Access Employees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 (HB0935)
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0532 (SB0432) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Database of Direct Access Employees - Establishment Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0590 /CH0413 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care Services Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0935 (SB0505) Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0996 Admissibility of Writings or Records of Health Care Providers Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0432 (HB0532) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Plan for Creation and Implementation of a Database of Direct Access Employees Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0505 (HB0935) Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM