Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006 (SB0572)
Title
Hospitals - Designation of Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0470
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 /CH0155
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563 /CH0364
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services - Military Families
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0572 (HB1006)
Title
Hospitals - Designation of Caregivers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0041
Title
Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1006 (SB0572) Hospitals - Designation of Caregivers Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 /CH0470 Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0297 /CH0155 Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0563 /CH0364 Developmental Disabilities Administration and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services - Military Families Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0572 (HB1006) Hospitals - Designation of Caregivers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 /CH0041 Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page