Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730 /CH0075 (SB0549/CH0074)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 (SB0895)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills Checklist
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277 /CH0377 (SB0336/CH0376)
Title
Hospitals - Designation of Lay Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334
Title
Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 /CH0376 (HB1277/CH0377)
Title
Hospitals - Designation of Lay Caregivers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 (HB1499)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 /CH0074 (HB0730/CH0075)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1235)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills Checklist
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0265 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser Registry Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0730 /CH0075 (SB0549/CH0074) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination Date Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 (SB0895) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills Checklist Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1277 /CH0377 (SB0336/CH0376) Hospitals - Designation of Lay Caregivers Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 /CH0376 (HB1277/CH0377) Hospitals - Designation of Lay Caregivers Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0413 (HB1499) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and Reporting Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0549 /CH0074 (HB0730/CH0075) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination Date Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1235) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills Checklist Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM