Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
Medicaid and the Maryland Children's Health Program - Home and Community-Based Providers - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1696 /CH0798 (SB1071)
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults With Medical Disabilities and Report on Home– and Community–Based Services
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071 (HB1696/CH0798)
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults With Medical Disabilities and Report on Home– and Community–Based Services
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0851 Medicaid and the Maryland Children's Health Program - Home and Community-Based Providers - Funding Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1696 /CH0798 (SB1071) Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults With Medical Disabilities and Report on Home– and Community–Based Services Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 798
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1071 (HB1696/CH0798) Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults With Medical Disabilities and Report on Home– and Community–Based Services Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page