Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0308 (SB0279/CH0309)
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Regulation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 /CH0390
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0309 (HB0251/CH0308)
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1041
Title
Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Fennell 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 10
Economic Matters
2/08/2019 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB0251 /CH0308 (SB0279/CH0309) Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA") Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0967 Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Regulation Requirements Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 /CH0390 Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0279 /CH0309 (HB0251/CH0308) Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA") Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1041 Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law) Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM