Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141 (SB0275)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 (SB0056)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0393)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0384)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0741)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 (HB0123)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0191)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0141)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384 (HB0652)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0551)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0836)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0141 (SB0275) Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0191 (SB0056) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0551 (SB0393) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0652 (SB0384) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0836 (SB0741) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Finance
SB0003 (HB0123) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0056 (HB0191) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0275 (HB0141) Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0384 (HB0652) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0393 (HB0551) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 (HB0836) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-30)
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 5:01 PM
Click to return on the top page