Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Home Detention

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373 /CH0608
Title
Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0484)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1757 (SB1124)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0480)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1124 (HB1757)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0373 /CH0608 Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0480 (SB0484) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1757 (SB1124) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0484 (HB0480) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention Programs Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1124 (HB1757) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page