Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Home Detention

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 (SB0086)
Title
Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 (SB0932)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0779)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0152
Title
Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 (HB0505)
Title
Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Transfer of Jurisdiction - Community Detention
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB0839)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 (HB0566)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0505 (SB0086) Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0566 (SB0932) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0779) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1406 /CH0152 Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19 Howard County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 (HB0505) Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 Juveniles Charged as Adults - Transfer of Jurisdiction - Community Detention Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0779 (HB0839) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0932 (HB0566) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2019 - 9:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM