Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Home Improvement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Home Improvement Contractors - Qualifications of Applicants - Trade Experience
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 (SB0185)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 /CH0657
Title
Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0440
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Membership, Quorum, Meetings, and Reports
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0332)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH0311 (HB0763)
Title
Insurance - Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Compensation for Deductible
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0159 Home Improvement Contractors - Qualifications of Applicants - Trade Experience Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0332 (SB0185) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 /CH0657 Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0066 /CH0440 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Membership, Quorum, Meetings, and Reports Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0185 (HB0332) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0736 /CH0311 (HB0763) Insurance - Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Compensation for Deductible Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM