Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Home Improvement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154 /CH0224
Title
Maryland Home Builder Registration Act - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0075
Title
Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0323)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Notices to Policyholders - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0442)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0154 /CH0224 Maryland Home Builder Registration Act - Guaranty Fund - Claims Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Economic Matters
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0182 /CH0075 Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0442 (SB0323) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0691 Homeowner's Insurance - Notices to Policyholders - Required Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
SB0323 (HB0442) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page