Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Home Improvement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0607
Title
Rebuilding Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371 (SB0819)
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 /CH0485
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 (SB0237)
Title
Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Discrimination in Housing - Military Status
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 (HB0877)
Title
Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0370
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Subcontractor Licensing Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 (HB0371)
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0036 /CH0607 Rebuilding Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0371 (SB0819) Independent Living Tax Credit Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 /CH0485 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 (SB0237) Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 Discrimination in Housing - Military Status Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0237 (HB0877) Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 /CH0370 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Subcontractor Licensing Requirement - Repeal Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 (HB0371) Independent Living Tax Credit Act Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM