Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Home Improvement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776
Title
Home Builders and Home Improvement Contractors - Contract Requirements - Consumer Protection Information
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB1016)
Title
Consumer Protection - Home Improvement Contractors - Home Improvement Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Home Builder Registration and Home Improvement Licenses - Professional Education Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0530
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016 (HB1290)
Title
Consumer Protection - Home Improvement Contractors - Home Improvement Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0770 Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0776 Home Builders and Home Improvement Contractors - Contract Requirements - Consumer Protection Information Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1290 (SB1016) Consumer Protection - Home Improvement Contractors - Home Improvement Contracts Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Home Builder Registration and Home Improvement Licenses - Professional Education Requirements Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0530 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 530
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1016 (HB1290) Consumer Protection - Home Improvement Contractors - Home Improvement Contracts Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:36 PM