Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Homeowners Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023 (SB0176)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 (SB0160)
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0449 (SB0161/CH0448)
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 (SB0794)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB0947/CH0077)
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc.
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1532 (SB1062)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 (HB0078)
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0448 (HB0286/CH0449)
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Transition of Control - Termination of Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 (HB0023)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0576)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947 /CH0077 (HB1194)
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0985
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Public Nuisance Suits
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1062 (HB1532)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 (SB0176) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special Assessments Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0078 (SB0160) Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0286 /CH0449 (SB0161/CH0448) Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0576 (SB0794) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0618 Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0811 Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1194 (SB0947/CH0077) Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc. Delegate Impallaria 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1532 (SB1062) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Attorney's Fees Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0136 Solar Energy Grant Program - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/30/2013 - 2:45 PM
SB0160 (HB0078) Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 /CH0448 (HB0286/CH0449) Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0162 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Transition of Control - Termination of Contracts Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0176 (HB0023) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special Assessments Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0576) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0947 /CH0077 (HB1194) Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc. Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0985 Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Public Nuisance Suits Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1062 (HB1532) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Attorney's Fees Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM