Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Homeowners Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0018)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners Association
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538
Title
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Governing Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0735 (SB0816)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB0902)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 (HB0405)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners Association
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540
Title
Morgan State University - Student Housing
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB1192/CH0735)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1452)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0405 (SB0018) Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners Association Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0538 Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1061 Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Governing Documents Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0735 (SB0816) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1377 Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 (SB0902) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0018 (HB0405) Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners Association Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0168 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0540 Morgan State University - Student Housing Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-45)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 (HB1192/CH0735) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0902 (HB1452) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM