Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Homicide -see also- Manslaughter; Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0223 (SB1088)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 /CH0177
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Membership - Family Member of Homicide Victim
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864
Title
Task Force on Assistance for Families of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1088 (HB0355/CH0223)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0355 /CH0223 (SB1088) Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 /CH0177 Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Membership - Family Member of Homicide Victim Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0864 Task Force on Assistance for Families of Homicide Victims Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1088 (HB0355/CH0223) Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM