Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Homicide -see also- Manslaughter; Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157 /CH0518
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0763)
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874
Title
Criminal Procedure - Homicide Investigations - Procedures (Joseph's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's License
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342 (SB0945/CH0512)
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0517
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0735)
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945 /CH0512 (HB1342)
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0157 /CH0518 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0735 (SB0763) Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0874 Criminal Procedure - Homicide Investigations - Procedures (Joseph's Law) Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's License Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 (SB0945/CH0512) Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law) Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0160 /CH0517 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 (HB0735) Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0945 /CH0512 (HB1342) Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law) Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM