Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Homicide -see also- Manslaughter; Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0533 (SB0185)
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0020
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Baltimore City - Investigation of Homicide Case Involving Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0193/CH0533)
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0193 /CH0533 (SB0185) Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0707 /CH0020 Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1372 Baltimore City - Investigation of Homicide Case Involving Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0185 (HB0193/CH0533) Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM