Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Homicide -see also- Manslaughter; Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 (SB0406)
Title
Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0406 (HB0093)
Title
Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 (SB0406) Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0926 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1164 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0166 Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0406 (HB0093) Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/10/2021 10:14 AM
Click to return on the top page