Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hospices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 /CH0670
Title
Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270
Title
Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310 (SB0834)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1159 /CH0670 Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 (SB0834) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM