Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hospices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0702)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 (SB0878)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Hospice of the Chesapeake Renovation Phase II
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 (SB0569)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Doey's House Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 /CH0240 (SB0923/CH0256)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0646)
Title
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 (HB0626)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Doey's House Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 (HB1253)
Title
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0395)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 (HB0586)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Hospice of the Chesapeake Renovation Phase II
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923 /CH0256 (HB0881/CH0240)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0395 (SB0702) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0586 (SB0878) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Hospice of the Chesapeake Renovation Phase II Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
HB0626 (SB0569) Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Doey's House Initiative Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
HB0881 /CH0240 (SB0923/CH0256) Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1253 (SB0646) State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0569 (HB0626) Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Doey's House Initiative Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 (HB1253) State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0395) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0878 (HB0586) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Hospice of the Chesapeake Renovation Phase II Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0923 /CH0256 (HB0881/CH0240) Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM