Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hospices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 (SB0063)
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 /CH0474
Title
Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Approval of Governor
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0418)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0873)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0382)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Practitioners - Exemption From Participation in Aid in Dying
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Hospice House of Charles County
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0905 (SB1102)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Montgomery Hospice Casey House
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0056)
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 (HB0456)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0404)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Doey's House
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0416)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1102 (HB0905)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Montgomery Hospice Casey House
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 (SB0063) Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 /CH0474 Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying Providers Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0255 Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Approval of Governor Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0404 (SB0418) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0416 (SB0873) Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0382) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 Health Occupations - Health Care Practitioners - Exemption From Participation in Aid in Dying Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0624 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Hospice House of Charles County Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0905 (SB1102) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Montgomery Hospice Casey House Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0063 (HB0056) Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 (HB0456) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0404) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Doey's House Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0873 (HB0416) Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1102 (HB0905) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Montgomery Hospice Casey House Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM