Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hospices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 /CH0015
Title
Health Care Facilities - Change in Bed Capacity - Certificate of Need Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 /CH0165
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697 /CH0418 (SB0868/CH0417)
Title
Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 /CH0473
Title
Health Care Facilities - Change in Bed Capacity - Certificate of Need Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0417 (HB0697/CH0418)
Title
Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0626 /CH0015 Health Care Facilities - Change in Bed Capacity - Certificate of Need Exemption Delegate Krebs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0662 /CH0165 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0697 /CH0418 (SB0868/CH0417) Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1061 Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 /CH0473 Health Care Facilities - Change in Bed Capacity - Certificate of Need Exemption Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 /CH0417 (HB0697/CH0418) Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM