Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Hospices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 /CH0230
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0701)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291
Title
Health Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exemption for Hospitals Providing Hospice Program Services
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 /CH0229
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB0643)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0512 /CH0230 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0643 (SB0701) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Judiciary
HB0692 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 Health Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exemption for Hospitals Providing Hospice Program Services Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0166 /CH0229 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 229
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0701 (HB0643) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:50 PM