Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hotels and Motels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091 /CH0063
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Laytonsville MC 12-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0492
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209
Title
Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 /CH0085
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses in Takoma Park MC 29-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 (SB0190)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0902/CH0205)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore County - License Fees
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 /CH0151
Title
Public Safety - Hotels and Lodging or Rooming Houses - Carbon Monoxide Alarms
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 (HB1065)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 /CH0205 (HB1240)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0091 /CH0063 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Laytonsville MC 12-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0137 /CH0492 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0209 Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2016
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0316 /CH0085 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses in Takoma Park MC 29-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0331 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1065 (SB0190) Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1240 (SB0902/CH0205) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0046 Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore County - License Fees Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 /CH0151 Public Safety - Hotels and Lodging or Rooming Houses - Carbon Monoxide Alarms Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0190 (HB1065) Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations Senator Madaleno 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 3 of 2016
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 /CH0205 (HB1240) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM