Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hotels and Motels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without Request
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597
Title
Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Repeal of Exception Regarding Hotel and Motel Rooms
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records, Human Trafficking Awareness Training, and Hourly Accommodations
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 /CH0144
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0093)
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030 (SB0846/CH0597)
Title
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175 (SB0834)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0928)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450 (SB1039/CH0430)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1650
Title
Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 (HB0935)
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834 (HB1175)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0597 (HB1030)
Title
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB1185)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 /CH0430 (HB1450)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1088 /CH0099 (HB1601)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0254 State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without Request Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0597 Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Repeal of Exception Regarding Hotel and Motel Rooms Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0673 Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records, Human Trafficking Awareness Training, and Hourly Accommodations Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 /CH0144 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 (SB0093) Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection Requirement Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 (SB0846/CH0597) Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations Delegate Anderson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 (SB0834) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 (SB0928) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1450 (SB1039/CH0430) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses Delegate Wivell 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1650 Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0093 (HB0935) Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection Requirement Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0445 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0530 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 (HB1175) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0597 (HB1030) Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 (HB1185) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 /CH0430 (HB1450) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1088 /CH0099 (HB1601) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM