Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Hotels and Motels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354
Title
Solid Waste Management - Personal Cleansing Products Provided at Lodging Establishments - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429
Title
Human Relations - Places of Public Accommodation - Pricing of Goods and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434
Title
Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771 (SB0158)
Title
Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB0375)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0383)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class BNR License – Newly Opened Restaurant
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Environment - Recycling - Hotels
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147 (SB0401)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1598
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0771)
Title
Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0864)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 (HB0865)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-3 License - Restaurant
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 (HB1147)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0354 Solid Waste Management - Personal Cleansing Products Provided at Lodging Establishments - Prohibition Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0382 Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0429 Human Relations - Places of Public Accommodation - Pricing of Goods and Services Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0434 Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0771 (SB0158) Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0860 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0864 (SB0375) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0865 (SB0383) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class BNR License – Newly Opened Restaurant Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0987 Environment - Recycling - Hotels Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1147 (SB0401) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1272 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1598 Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1604 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0023 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0158 (HB0771) Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Special Order until end of this calendar (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0375 (HB0864) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0383 (HB0865) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-3 License - Restaurant Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0401 (HB1147) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:43 PM