Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Hotels and Motels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0876)
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901 (SB0529)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061 (SB0832)
Title
Southern Maryland – Multifamily Dwelling Registration – Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176 (SB0730)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179 (SB0794)
Title
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301 (SB0789)
Title
Baltimore City – Visit Baltimore – Appropriation Calculation
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 (HB0901)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610
Title
Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1176)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB1301)
Title
Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB1179)
Title
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Sponsor
Wicomico County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1061)
Title
Southern Maryland – Multifamily Dwelling Registration – Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB0338)
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0287 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0338 (SB0876) Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0901 (SB0529) Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue Delegate Bartlett 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1061 (SB0832) Southern Maryland – Multifamily Dwelling Registration – Fees and Fines Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1152 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1176 (SB0730) Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Expenses Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1179 (SB0794) Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1301 (SB0789) Baltimore City – Visit Baltimore – Appropriation Calculation Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0529 (HB0901) Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue Senator Elfreth 4 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0610 Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB1176) Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Expenses Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0789 (HB1301) Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation Senator McCray 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0794 (HB1179) Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development Wicomico County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0832 (HB1061) Southern Maryland – Multifamily Dwelling Registration – Fees and Fines Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 (HB0338) Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 11:17 AM
Click to return on the top page